Global Patent Index - EP 0695835 B1

EP 0695835 B1 2000-04-26 - Grating for a surface drainage channel

Title (en)

Grating for a surface drainage channel

Title (de)

Abdeckrost für eine Oberflächenentwässerungsrinne

Title (fr)

Grille de recouvrement pour un caniveau d'écoulement de surface

Publication

EP 0695835 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95115949 A

Priority

  • DE 4241705 A
  • DE 4327810 A
  • EP 93119304 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0601447A1] Drainage gutters are known, which exhibit a covering (30) with cutouts (31, 31') which can be fastened, by means of fastening devices, on a gutter body (1) installed in the ground. It is proposed to provide, as fastening devices, at least one locking bar (60) which is mounted in the covering (30) and can be displaced, in the direction of a longitudinal border (32) of the covering (30), into a locking position and out of this into an opening position. Provided on the body (1) is a locking-bar counterpiece (26) which, upon displacement of the locking bar (60) into the locking position, moves into engagement with the locking bar (60) such that the covering (30) is held on the body (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 5/06; E01C 11/22; E02D 29/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 9/10 (2006.01); E01C 11/22 (2006.01); E02D 29/14 (2006.01); E03F 5/04 (2006.01); E03F 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/14 (2013.01); E01C 11/227 (2013.01); E02D 29/1427 (2013.01); E03F 5/06 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

GB 2006305 A 19790502 - KUPER GUMMI GMBH

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0601447 A1 19940615; EP 0601447 B1 20000816; AT 192202 T 20000515; AT 195566 T 20000915; CA 2111127 A1 19940611; CZ 280595 B6 19960214; CZ 9302689 A3 19940615; EP 0695835 A2 19960207; EP 0695835 A3 19960327; EP 0695835 B1 20000426; ES 2147811 T3 20001001; ES 2150930 T3 20001216; NO 934465 A 19940613; NO 934465 D0 19931208; PL 172414 B1 19970930; PL 301388 A1 19940613; US 5462382 A 19951031

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-09-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59310020

- Effective date: 20130601

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120130

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2009-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061128

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-11-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051118

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030601

2003-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030601

2001-11-23 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ACO SEVERIN AHLMANN G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147811 T3

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59310020 20000531

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 601447

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR IT LI LU NL SE

2000-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192202 T 20000515

1998-08-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980709

1996-10-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960904

1996-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR IT LI LU NL SE

1996-02-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 601447

1996-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR IT LI LU NL SE