Global patent index - EP 0695908 B1

EP 0695908 B1 2000-03-22 - Device for fixing and sealing a power supply cable to a light fixture mounted at the free end of a pole

Title (en)

Device for fixing and sealing a power supply cable to a light fixture mounted at the free end of a pole

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Halterung und Abdichtung eines Zuführungskabels zu einer am freien Ende eines Mastes aufgebrachten Mastleuchte

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation et d'étanchéité d'un câble d'alimentation à une armature de lampadaire montée à l'extrémité libre d'un mât

Publication

EP 0695908 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95111953 A

Priority

DE 4427711 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0695908A1] The lamp housing (32) at the top of its column (10) has a tubular projection (32a) to which a cover is screwed with a seal (44) for the opening (32e) of the connection space (32f). A cable termination (22) within this space provides for tightening preferably to the IP54 standard. A flanged plate (15) fitted to the inner end of the tubular projection contains an aperture (21) with an internal thread into which the cable termination is screwed. A U-shaped strap (23) has a retaining groove (24) on its inner edges into which the flange enters.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 21/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/116 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/116 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0695908 A1 19960207; EP 0695908 B1 20000322; AT 191078 T 20000415; DE 4427711 A1 19960215; DE 4427711 C2 19970528

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150728

2015-08-19 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20150728

2015-08-05 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20150729

2015-07-29 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59508033

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140624

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140731

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140710

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140624

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080729

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-12-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: COOPER CROUSE-HINDS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2004-09-24 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508033

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-27

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 191078

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990601

1996-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960731

1996-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CEAG SICHERHEITSTECHNIK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1996-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL