Global patent index - EP 0695923 B1

EP 0695923 B1 2001-04-11 - Lining applied to the interior walls of ovens

Title (en)

Lining applied to the interior walls of ovens

Title (de)

Auskleiden der Innenwände von Öfen

Title (fr)

Revêtement des parois internes de fours

Publication

EP 0695923 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95830323 A

Priority

IT MC940067 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0695923A1] This invention concerns a tool for lining the layer of ceramic insulation applied to the interior walls of ovens consisting of a series of cell-like plates made of refractory material abutting securely against the ceramic layer by means of fixing mechanisms also realised in refractory material. <MATH>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27D 1/14; F27D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F27D 1/00 (2006.01); F27D 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27D 1/144 (2013.01); F27D 1/0009 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0695923 A1 19960207; EP 0695923 B1 20010411; DE 69520622 D1 20010517; DE 69520622 T2 20011115; ES 2157310 T3 20010816; IT 1275119 B 19970730; IT MC940067 A1 19960206; IT MC940067 D0 19940805; PT 695923 E 20010928

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070726

2009-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070727

2008-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070727

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-05-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080128

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-02-13 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20080128

2007-06-08 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: D3

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070131

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-01-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-01-26 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-09-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-08-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2157310

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-06-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TECN. ING. CLAUDIO BALDI

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69520622

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-17

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT

2000-04-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: LINING APPLIED TO THE INTERIOR WALLS OF OVENS

1999-07-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: LINING APPLIED TO THE INTERIOR WALLS OF OVENS

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981030

1996-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960727

1996-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT