Global Patent Index - EP 0696807 B1

EP 0696807 B1 2000-07-19 - Product for decontaminating surfaces soiled by radioactive and/or toxic chemical substances

Title (en)

Product for decontaminating surfaces soiled by radioactive and/or toxic chemical substances

Title (de)

Produkt zur Dekontamination radioaktiv und/oder giftig verunreinigter Oberflächen

Title (fr)

Produit pour la décontamination des surfaces souillées par des substances radioactives et/ou des toxiques chimiques

Publication

EP 0696807 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95401830 A

Priority

FR 9409805 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0696807A1] A prod. for the decontamination of surfaces, materials, the skin, mucous membranes and wounds contaminated by radioactive and/or toxic chemicals, comprises a liq. soap based on oil with a high index of saponification very precisely saponified with an alkali. Pref. the oil is a vegetable oil, esp. pref. coco oil or palm oil, and the alkali is KOH, triethanolamine or NaOH. The compsn. may contain up to 20 wt.% of complexant salts, esp. less than 20% (less than 1%) of salts of EDTA or DTPQ, partic. Na or K salts, with pH the same at the pH of the soap. The compsn. may be a liq. detergent contg. up to 20 wt.% of complexing salts. Decontamination of materials, surfaces, the skin, the mucous membranes or wounds by application of the soap or the compsn. is claimed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21F 9/00; C11D 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 9/02 (2006.01); C11D 9/30 (2006.01); C11D 17/08 (2006.01); G21F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 9/30 (2013.01); C11D 9/02 (2013.01); C11D 17/08 (2013.01); G21F 9/001 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Ullmanns Encyclopädie der technischen Chemie 4. Auflage band 21, 209-25

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0696807 A1 19960214; EP 0696807 B1 20000719; DE 69518043 D1 20000824; DE 69518043 T2 20010322; FR 2723465 A1 19960209; FR 2723465 B1 19960920

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070911

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2005-08-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050812

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2002-07-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020726

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-17 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69518043

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-24

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI

2000-07-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-05-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI

1999-11-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PRODUCT FOR DECONTAMINATING SURFACES SOILED BY RADIOACTIVE AND/OR TOXIC CHEMICAL SUBSTANCES

1999-10-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PRODUCT FOR DECONTAMINATING SURFACES SOILED BY RADIOACTIVE AND/OR TOXIC CHEMICAL SUBSTANCES

1998-08-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980617

1996-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960806

1996-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI