Global patent index - EP 0696826 B1

EP 0696826 B1 2000-01-26 - System for guiding a cable connected with an antenna mounted on a mobile section of a telescopic mast

Title (en)

System for guiding a cable connected with an antenna mounted on a mobile section of a telescopic mast

Title (de)

System zur Führung eines mit einer Antenne verbundenen Kabels, wobei die Antenne auf einem mobilen Abschnitt eines Teleskopmastes montiert ist

Title (fr)

Système de guidage d'un câble relié à une antenne montée sur un tronçon mobile d'un mât télescopique

Publication

EP 0696826 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95401866 A

Priority

FR 9409995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0696826A1] The antenna (12) is mounted on a trellis beam (11) sliding in and out of a fixed section (10) of the mast. The feeder cable (13) is hooked at several points to a traction cable over a portion of its length. The traction cable has one fixing point (31) on the moving section and another fixing point (32) near the middle of the fixed section, within which a carriage (16) driven by the traction cable carries and guides a pulley (15).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/12; E04H 12/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 12/18 (2006.01); H01Q 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/1235 (2013.01); E04H 12/182 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0696826 A1 19960214; EP 0696826 B1 20000126; DE 69514730 D1 20000302; DE 69514730 T2 20000817; FR 2723665 A1 19960216; FR 2723665 B1 19960913

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150808

2015-09-02 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20150808

2015-08-09 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69514730

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140828

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140820

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-03-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69514730

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-02

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1999-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCATEL

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990604

1996-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960629

1996-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT