Global Patent Index - EP 0697364 B1

EP 0697364 B1 2000-04-26 - Lifting ring for lateral loads

Title (en)

Lifting ring for lateral loads

Title (de)

Hebering zum Aufnehmen von seitlichen Lasten

Title (fr)

Anneau de levage pour la prise latérale de charges

Publication

EP 0697364 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95401901 A

Priority

FR 9410100 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0697364A1] The ring consists of a shaft (1) with a threaded shank (2) designed to screw into a threaded hole in the load to be lifted, and a head (7). The shaft is surrounded by a one-piece intermediate member (4) which can rotate through 360 degrees and has radial projections (8,8') for a swivelling coupling loop (10). A threaded thrust base (3) is screwed onto the shank and locked in place, with the intermediate member rotatable about the base and held axially between projecting sections (5,6) of the base and head. The outer face of the base, which presses against the load, has a slight inward inclination. The base can be locked onto the shank with an adhesive which cannot be removed without special treatment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 1/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 1/66 (2006.01); F16B 45/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 1/66 (2013.01); Y10T 403/32213 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT LU SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0697364 A1 19960221; EP 0697364 B1 20000426; CA 2155798 A1 19960219; CA 2155798 C 19980609; DE 69516469 D1 20000531; DE 69516469 T2 20001214; ES 2147826 T3 20001001; FR 2723770 A1 19960223; FR 2723770 B1 19961018; JP H0891766 A 19960409; US 5580110 A 19961203

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150818

2015-11-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151126

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150816

2015-09-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-09-09 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150816

2015-08-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69516469

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140828

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140827

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140617

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20140604

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140617

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147826 T3

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-07-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FIAMMENGHI - DOMENIGHETTI

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516469 20000531

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT LU SE

1999-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990929

1996-10-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960816

1996-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT LU SE