Global Patent Index - EP 0697365 B1

EP 0697365 B1 2001-03-14 - Vehicle safety jack

Title (en)

Vehicle safety jack

Title (de)

Sicherheitswagenheber

Title (fr)

Chic de sécurité pour véhicule

Publication

EP 0697365 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95500110 A

Priority

ES 9401754 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0697365A1] A vehicle safety jack, which includes a housing in the body of the jaw or clamp itself, into which are received two washers (14, 16) and a ball bearing cage (15), which are situated over the end of the screw spindle, with the most outwardly or front washer being secured to the end of the screw spindle by riveting. The support member that forms the foot (1) has windows (9) cut into it, creating internal lugs whose thickness controls the maximum opening of the other support member (2) and safeguards it. <MATH>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 3/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0697365 A1 19960221; EP 0697365 B1 20010314; BR 9503538 A 19960528; DE 69520316 D1 20010419; ES 2121490 A1 19981116; ES 2121490 B1 19990516

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010725

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-08-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-07-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010725

2001-06-16 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010616

2001-06-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010614

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69520316 20010419

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-03-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000615

1996-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960610

1996-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE