Global Patent Index - EP 0697454 B1

EP 0697454 B1 2000-05-03 - Acid-treated inorganic shaped articles and their use

Title (en)

Acid-treated inorganic shaped articles and their use

Title (de)

Säurebehandelte anorganische Formkörper und deren Verwendung

Title (fr)

Corps moulés inorganiques et leur application

Publication

EP 0697454 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95112751 A

Priority

DE 4429643 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0697454A2] Use of porous inorganic mouldings, which have been treated and/or charged with acid, to remove basic nitrogen cpds., esp. NH3 or basic nitrogen hydrocarbon cpds., from mixts. contg. them.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 25/00; C10G 25/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 25/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0697454 A2 19960221; EP 0697454 A3 19960424; EP 0697454 B1 20000503; DE 4429643 A1 19960222; ES 2147249 T3 20000901

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050812

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20010911

2001-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010501

2001-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20000812

2000-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147249 T3

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000807

2000-08-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000813

2000-08-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000812

2000-06-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508247 20000608

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-09-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980721

1996-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960614

1996-06-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAEHN, REINHARD, DR.

1996-06-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEYDA, HARTMUT, DR.

1996-06-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BURGFELS, GOETZ, DR.

1996-06-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHMIDT, FRIEDRICH WILHELM, PROF. DR.

1996-06-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ENGELHARDT, THOMAS, DR.

1996-06-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KREMER, HANS-JOACHIM, DR.

1996-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1996-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT