Global Patent Index - EP 0697568 B1

EP 0697568 B1 2000-01-12 - Connection oven and oven frame

Title (en)

Connection oven and oven frame

Title (de)

Verbindung von Backrohr und Backrohr-Aufnahmerahmen

Title (fr)

connexion four et cadre de four

Publication

EP 0697568 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95114355 A

Priority

EP 95114355 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0697568A2] The oven is used for cooking. The gap (17) is formed between the parallel plane edge parts (5a,11a) on the interior tube (3,5) and on the tube receiver frame (9,11). The edge parts are bent in a rectangular manner w.r.t. the frame. The gap is bridged at two circumferential points (23) by oppositely placed flanges (21) which are releasably joined to each other. A seal (25) is anchored along its entire length inside the gap.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0697568 A2 19960221; EP 0697568 A3 19960320; EP 0697568 B1 20000112; DE 59507596 D1 20000217

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-16 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-10-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021002

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-11-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20011127

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-06-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507596 20000217

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI SE

2000-01-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

1997-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970605

1996-08-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI SE

1996-07-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960514

1996-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH LI

1996-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI SE