Global patent index - EP 0697619 B1

EP 0697619 B1 2001-01-17 - High-contrast photographic elements with improved maximum density

Title (en)

High-contrast photographic elements with improved maximum density

Title (de)

Photographische Hochkontrastelemente mit verbesserter Maximaldichte

Title (fr)

Eléments photographiques à contraste élevé et à densité maximale améliorée

Publication

EP 0697619 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95202188 A

Priority

US 29211994 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0697619A2] A high-contrast room-light-handleable black-and-white silver halide photographic element that is especially adapted for use in the field of graphic arts comprises fine-grain high-chloride silver halide grains doped with a dopant comprised of a transition metal and a nitrosyl or thionitrosyl coordination ligand. The dopant is present in the grains in an amount sufficient to reduce speed and increase contrast and at least 25 percent by weight of the total amount of the dopant within the grains is located within the outermost 90 percent of the total grain volume to reduce the effects of solarization and intermittency and thereby enhance the maximum density of the element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/08; G03C 1/035; G03C 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/035 (2006.01); G03C 1/06 (2006.01); G03C 1/08 (2006.01); G03C 1/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0697619 A2 19960221; EP 0697619 A3 19970205; EP 0697619 B1 20010117; DE 69519901 D1 20010222; DE 69519901 T2 20010719; JP H0862760 A 19960308

INPADOC legal status

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070811

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050707

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070811

2006-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-07-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060706

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2002-08-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020805

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69519901

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-22

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971120

1997-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970710

1997-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB