Global Patent Index - EP 0697750 B1

EP 0697750 B1 2001-02-21 - Terminal, in particular connexion terminal with single input

Title (en)

Terminal, in particular connexion terminal with single input

Title (de)

Anschlussklemme, insbesondere Verbindungsklemme mit einer einzigen Einführungsöffnung

Title (fr)

Borne de connexion, en particulier borne de connexion à entrée unique

Publication

EP 0697750 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95401847 A

Priority

FR 9409814 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0697750A1] The connection terminal includes an insulating material housing (14) and at least one connecting stud (15) for receiving at least one electric conductor (12). Two edges (22A,22B) of an opening of the housing lie respectively on the same side and on opposite sides relative to the pinch screw (18). The one (22B) adjacent to the screw may make a greater angle of inclination than the one (22B) opposite by a factor of 1.3-2.2. Alternatively, the two angles may be equal. One edge comprises more than 180 degrees of the hole opening and the other less. They meet at an edge which extends from the front face of the conducting element back to the internal surface of the hole. A variation connects these to edges to make a single edge by joining along an edge lying short distance from the internal surface. The insulating block has a channelled input sleeve (30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/36 (2006.01); H01R 4/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/36 (2013.01); H01R 4/301 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0697750 A1 19960221; EP 0697750 B1 20010221; AU 2842195 A 19960222; AU 688532 B2 19980312; DE 69520125 D1 20010329; DE 69520125 T2 20010607; ES 2154324 T3 20010401; FR 2723475 A1 19960209; FR 2723475 B1 19961031; GR 3035685 T3 20010629; PT 697750 E 20010731

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100807

2010-10-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040810

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090820

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEGRAND

- Effective date: 20050831

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEGRAND SNC

- Effective date: 20050831

2006-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050808

2006-03-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060302

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-02-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060207

2005-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050808

2004-09-01 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040901

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-08-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040816

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-08-10 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040810

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-08-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040806

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-27 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20040727

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010508

2001-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154324 T3

2001-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69520125 20010329

2001-02-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GR IT PT

2000-05-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TERMINAL, IN PARTICULAR CONNEXION TERMINAL WITH SINGLE INPUT

1998-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971119

1996-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960313

1996-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GR IT PT