Global Patent Index - EP 0697803 B1

EP 0697803 B1 2000-03-01 - Circuit for operating discharge lamps

Title (en)

Circuit for operating discharge lamps

Title (de)

Schaltungsanordnung zur Ansteuerung von Gasentladungslampen

Title (fr)

Circuit pour alimenter des lampes à décharge

Publication

EP 0697803 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95112985 A

Priority

CH 254694 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0697803A2] The circuit has a bias stage connected between the positive and negative terminals of a rectifier bridge (D1,D2,D3,D4) coupled to the AC network, the bias stage including a filter circuit (C1,C2,C3,DR1,DR2) and a HF oscillator (R2-R6,T1,T2,D5,D6,C6,I1,I2). The inductive windings (I1,I2) of the HF oscillator are wound on a common core with a third inductance (I3,I4) to form a current transformer. A series current limiting circuit with an inductance (DR3,I4) and a capacitor (C8) is inserted in the current circuit between one terminal of the discharge lamp (FL) and the rectifier bridge.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/24 (2006.01); H05B 41/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0697803 A2 19960221; EP 0697803 A3 19960501; EP 0697803 B1 20000301; AT 190185 T 20000315; CN 1118980 A 19960320; DE 59507872 D1 20000406; ES 2146685 T3 20000816; JP H0896979 A 19960412; KR 100396386 B1 20031206

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070817

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070818

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070817

2008-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070818

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070817

2008-06-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060824

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070818

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070817

2008-04-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060824

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-08-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060830

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-08-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060825

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-08-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060824

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-08-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060824

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-08-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060824

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-08-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060824

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-02-03 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Free text: A REQUEST FOR RESTORATION TO THE PRIOR STATE AS PROVIDED FOR IN ARTICLE 23 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995 (SEE PUBLICATION IN HEADING XE OF THE PATENT BULLETIN OF 20020603/06) HAS BEEN GRANTED; THE RESTORATION OF THE PATENT HAS BEEN ENTERED IN THE PATENT REGISTER.

2002-06-03 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Free text: A REQUEST FOR RESTORATION TO THE PRIOR STATE (ART. 23 OF THE PATENTS ACT) HAS BEEN FILED ON 20.03.2002.

2002-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2001-07-13 [REG CH AUV] UNDELIVERABLE DECISIONS OPENED (PATENTS)

- Free text: DAS OBGENANNTE PATENT IST, MANGELS BEZAHLUNG DER 06. JAHRESGEBÜHR INNERT DER GESETZLICHEN FRIST, DURCH VERFÜGUNG VOM 31.03.2001 ERLOSCHEN.

2001-04-12 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MUESSLI DANIEL

- Effective date: 20000831

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010109

2000-12-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2000-10-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: PINBEAM AG

2000-10-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: PINBEAM AG

2000-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146685 T3

2000-08-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PINBEAM AG

2000-08-09 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MUESSLI, DANIEL

2000-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000601

2000-06-01 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000601

2000-05-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507872 20000406

2000-03-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190185 T 20000315

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 05B 41/00 A

1997-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970321

1997-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970117

1996-05-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1996-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE