Global patent index - EP 0697944 B1

EP 0697944 B1 2001-03-14 - FILTER FABRIC

Title (en)

FILTER FABRIC

Title (de)

FILTERGEWEBE

Title (fr)

TISSU FILTRANT

Publication

EP 0697944 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94913719 A

Priority

  • GB 9400905 W
  • GB 9309066 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2277536A] A filter for use in a concrete press mould comprises a fabric (19) knit or woven at least in part from hydrophobic, eg PVC or polypropylene, having a fabric density which permits the passage of water therethrough but prohibits the passage of particulate material. The fabric may be bounded around its periphery with at least one continuous imperforate band formed by fushion of the yarns. The filter may comprise a perforated plate (14) and a sponge layer (41), e.g. of foamed plastics. A preferred fabric is warp knitted with the use of a fall plate to produce floats on the face of the fabric. Flat yarn may be used. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 7/00; D03D 1/00; D03D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/46 (2006.01); D03D 1/00 (2006.01); D03D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 15/00 (2013.01); B28B 7/46 (2013.01); D03D 1/00 (2013.01); D03D 15/0088 (2013.01); D10B 2321/022 (2013.01); D10B 2321/041 (2013.01); D10B 2401/021 (2013.01); D10B 2505/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FR IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2277536 A 19941102; GB 2277536 B 19970402; GB 9322488 D0 19931222; AU 6576094 A 19941121; AU 695079 B2 19980806; CA 2161677 A1 19941110; CA 2161677 C 20001010; DE 69426876 D1 20010419; DE 69426876 T2 20010621; EP 0697944 A1 19960228; EP 0697944 B1 20010314; GB 9309066 D0 19930616; WO 9425236 A2 19941110; WO 9425236 A3 19941222

INPADOC legal status

2014-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140428

2014-06-04 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK9A

2014-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130625

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130412

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130410

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110429

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111101

2011-11-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-11-09 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20111101

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69426876

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100409

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ECO FILTERS LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100430

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100402

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090422

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-11-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ECO FILTERS LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20070814

2007-09-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2007-04-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ECO FILTERS LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-06-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-06-14 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010614

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69426876

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-19

2001-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR IE IT LI NL SE

2001-03-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

1997-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971020

1996-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19951103

1996-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR IE IT LI NL SE