Global patent index - EP 0698169 B1

EP 0698169 B1 2000-11-15 - DOOR LEAF

Title (en)

DOOR LEAF

Title (de)

TORBLATT

Title (fr)

BATTANT DE PORTE

Publication

EP 0698169 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95911319 A

Priority

  • DE 9403956 U
  • EP 9500890 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9524536A1] A door leaf, in particular of a sectional door, comprises a plurality of panels (10A, 10B, ...) which can be interconnected at their adjacent longitudinal sides (11A, 11B) by means of hinges (12), wherein the axis of rotation (12A) of the hinges (12) extends substantially in the centre of the thickness (W) of the panels (10A, 10B, ...), and wherein each longitudinal side (11A) of the panels (10A, 10B, ...) comprises a cylindrical, preferably circular cylindrical, joint sleeve (14) which substantially extends over the entire length of the panel and has an elongate slot for accommodating at least one hinge part (15B) which is connected to the adjacent longitudinal side (11B) of the next panel and is longitudinally displaceable in the joint sleeve (14). Inter alia, improved ease of passage is achieved in that multi-part strap hinges inserted into the joint sleeve (14) are provided with strap parts (12B, 12C) which can be rotated relative to one another about a common axis (12A), and in that at least one respective first strap part (12C) is secured in a position to be determined along the joint sleeve (14) on the panel (10A, 10B, ...) comprising the joint sleeve and at least one second respective strap part (12B) is secured in a position to be determined along the next panel by means of a strap tab (12D) engaging through the elongate slot (14A) of the joint sleeve (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/24; E06B 3/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/16 (2006.01); E05D 15/24 (2006.01); E06B 3/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/485 (2013.01); E05D 15/165 (2013.01); E05D 15/242 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/41 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/106 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 9403956 U1 19950720; AT 197625 T 20001215; CZ 9502924 A3 19960515; EP 0698169 A1 19960228; EP 0698169 B1 20001115; PL 179392 B1 20000831; PL 311580 A1 19960219; WO 9524536 A1 19950914

INPADOC legal status

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2007-06-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050310

2004-04-02 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040402

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-03-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-04-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508856

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-21

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 197625

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990301

1996-09-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

1996-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19951206

1996-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI