Global Patent Index - EP 0698173 B1

EP 0698173 B1 2000-04-26 - ARRANGEMENT IN A VENTILATING MANTLE

Title (en)

ARRANGEMENT IN A VENTILATING MANTLE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG IN EINER LÜFTUNGSHÜLLE

Title (fr)

CONCEPTION D'UNE OUIE D'AERATION

Publication

EP 0698173 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94929703 A

Priority

  • SE 9400811 W
  • SE 9400748 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9523906A1] Arrangement in a ventilation mantle (3) preferably to be used in windows and doors and said mantle is intended to be fastened to a ventilating opening (1) in a ventilation channel (4) of a window profile or door profile so that not too humid and too strongly ventilated and cooled air is pressed into the ventilation channel (4). By wall formations (7) within the interior of a ventilation mantle (3) at least one air lock looking ventilation channel (14) is created which shall give slowness to air streams (5) passing through the ventilation mantle (3) in order to give an effect similar to that of a heat exchanger to the air streams (5) passing through the ventilation mantle (3) and thereby preventing too cool and humid air (5) to pass into the ventilation channel (4) of the window- or door profile (2) by a too high velocity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 7/02; F24F 13/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/02 (2006.01); F24F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/02 (2013.01); F24F 7/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9523906 A1 19950908; AT 192211 T 20000515; DE 69424164 D1 20000531; DE 69424164 T2 20010125; EP 0698173 A1 19960228; EP 0698173 B1 20000426; SE 9400748 D0 19940304; SE 9400748 L 19950905

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-06-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NIEMANN HANS-DIETER

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2001-11-19 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011119

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-10-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011023

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-09-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010928

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20000902

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-09-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000902

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424164 20000531

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-04-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192211 T 20000515

1997-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970217

1996-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951201

1996-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL