Global Patent Index - EP 0698417 B1

EP 0698417 B1 2002-11-13 - Sprinkler for dispensing a fluid

Title (en)

Sprinkler for dispensing a fluid

Title (de)

Regner zum Austragen eines Fluids

Title (fr)

Arroseur pour la distribution d'un fluide

Publication

EP 0698417 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95112644 A

Priority

DE 4429952 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0698417A2] The sprinkler has a vertical mounting with a water flow driven turbine (8) which rotates faster than a direct driven rotor using a gearing (9) to step up the rotational speed. A water flow divider (7) with shaped contour spreads the water flow while the fast rotating head provides an added sprinkling effect. The spreading effect is adjustable by a rotating sleeve control (5). This adjusts the range of the sprinkling. The rotating drive provides a fast rotation even with low water pressures. The gearing includes eccentric gears.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 3/04; B05B 3/02; B05B 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 3/04 (2006.01); B05B 15/70 (2018.01); B05B 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 3/003 (2013.01); B05B 3/0486 (2013.01); B05B 15/70 (2018.02); B05B 15/74 (2018.02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0698417 A2 19960228; EP 0698417 A3 19961211; EP 0698417 B1 20021113; EP 0698417 B2 20060118; AT 227608 T 20021115; AU 2855995 A 19960307; AU 699756 B2 19981217; DE 4429952 A1 19960229; ES 2185677 T3 20030501; US 5718381 A 19980217; ZA 9507104 B 19960415

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2007-03-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-09-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060921

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060429

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-01-18 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20060118

2006-01-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2005-08-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GARDENA MANUFACTURING GMBH

2005-08-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050811

2004-08-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040826

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040819

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-09-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CLABER S.P.A

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030811

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021113

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185677 T3

2003-02-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59510452 20021219

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227608 T 20021115

1997-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970509

1997-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970124

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1996-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE