Global Patent Index - EP 0698435 B1

EP 0698435 B1 2000-04-19 - Powder metallurgy apparatus and process using electrostatic die wall lubrication

Title (en)

Powder metallurgy apparatus and process using electrostatic die wall lubrication

Title (de)

Verfahren und Werkzeug der Pulvermetallurgie mit elektrostatischer Schmierung der Wände der Pressform

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation de la métallurgie des poudres comprenant une lubrification électrostatique des parois de la matrice

Publication

EP 0698435 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95113167 A

Priority

  • US 29497994 A
  • US 47946495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0698435A1] A method of making a metal composite part by compacting a metal powder composition in a die whose wall surfaces have been electrostatically coated with a lubricant, thereby eliminating or reducing a lubricant in the metal powder composition, resulting in a metal composite having greater density and strength. The method further includes providing an electrostatic charge to the metal powder composition. A powder metallurgy apparatus is also provided. <MATH>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22F 3/02; B30B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 3/00 (2006.01); B22F 3/02 (2006.01); B30B 15/00 (2006.01); C22C 1/04 (2006.01); C22C 33/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 3/00 (2013.01); B22F 3/02 (2013.01); B30B 15/0011 (2013.01); B22F 2003/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0698435 A1 19960228; EP 0698435 B1 20000419; CA 2156872 A1 19960225; CA 2156872 C 20050823; DE 69516343 D1 20000525; DE 69516343 T2 20001019; ES 2147583 T3 20000916; JP 3383731 B2 20030304; JP H08100203 A 19960416

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050822

2004-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030823

2004-04-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-03-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-08-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030823

2003-08-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030823

2003-08-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030822

2002-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020826

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020823

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020729

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147583 T3

2000-07-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2000-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516343 20000525

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

1999-02-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981228

1996-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960808

1996-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE