Global Patent Index - EP 0698656 B1

EP 0698656 B1 2000-10-18 - Oil-soluble reaction products of polyenes

Title (en)

Oil-soluble reaction products of polyenes

Title (de)

Öllösliche Reaktionsprodukte von Polyenen

Title (fr)

Produits de réaction de polyènes solubles dans l'huile

Publication

EP 0698656 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95202242 A

Priority

  • EP 95202242 A
  • EP 94306237 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0698656A1] The invention provides reaction products of: (A) an acylating reagent, with (D) a polyalkenyl derivative of an ethylenically unsaturated carboxylic reagent (C), and (E) a polyamine containing at least two -NH2 and/or - NH groups, or with (F) the pre-formed product of reagents (D) and (E), wherein the acylating reagent (A) is the reaction product of (B) a C4-C20 polyene or oligomer prepared therefrom, and (C) an ethylenically unsaturated carboxylic reagent; lubricating oil compositions, fuel compositions and additive concentrates containing them; and use of the reaction products as dispersant additives.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 133/52; C10L 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/14 (2006.01); C10L 1/22 (2006.01); C10L 1/238 (2006.01); C10L 1/2383 (2006.01); C10L 1/2387 (2006.01); C10M 133/52 (2006.01); C10L 1/16 (2006.01); C10L 1/18 (2006.01); C10L 1/28 (2006.01); C10L 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/238 (2013.01); C10L 1/143 (2013.01); C10L 1/221 (2013.01); C10L 1/2383 (2013.01); C10L 1/2387 (2013.01); C10M 133/52 (2013.01); C10L 1/1608 (2013.01); C10L 1/1616 (2013.01); C10L 1/1641 (2013.01); C10L 1/1811 (2013.01); C10L 1/1824 (2013.01); C10L 1/1832 (2013.01); C10L 1/1852 (2013.01); C10L 1/1857 (2013.01); C10L 1/188 (2013.01); C10L 1/191 (2013.01); C10L 1/198 (2013.01); C10L 1/1985 (2013.01); C10L 1/223 (2013.01); C10L 1/226 (2013.01); C10L 1/231 (2013.01); C10L 1/2364 (2013.01); C10L 1/2366 (2013.01); C10L 1/2381 (2013.01); C10L 1/285 (2013.01); C10L 1/305 (2013.01); C10L 1/306 (2013.01); C10M 2215/04 (2013.01); C10M 2215/26 (2013.01); C10M 2217/046 (2013.01); C10M 2217/06 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10N 2210/02 (2013.01); C10N 2240/10 (2013.01); C10N 2240/101 (2013.01); C10N 2240/104 (2013.01); C10N 2240/106 (2013.01); C10N 2270/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0698656 A1 19960228; EP 0698656 B1 20001018

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.

- Effective date: 20050831

2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050818

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-08-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050818

2004-09-01 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040901

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-08-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040804

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040713

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040707

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69519141 20001123

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-10-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-03-15 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 19960708

1999-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6C 10M 133/52 A, 6C 10L 1/22 B, 6C 10N 30:04 Z

1999-10-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6C 10M 133/52 A, 6C 10L 1/22 B, 6C 10N 30:04 Z

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990208

1996-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960708

1996-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL