Global patent index - EP 0699035 B1

EP 0699035 B1 2000-04-19 - CUSHIONING MEMBER FOR AN ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR

Title (en)

CUSHIONING MEMBER FOR AN ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR

Title (de)

POLSTERUNGSTEIL FÜR SCHUHWERK

Title (fr)

AMORTISSEUR POUR UN ARTICLE CHAUSSANT

Publication

EP 0699035 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94907885 A

Priority

  • CA 2181998 A
  • US 9400895 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9520332A1] A cushioning member (10) for an article of footwear is provided having a series of interconnected chambers (26 and 42) filled with ambient or slightly pressurized air. Impedance means (74) is provided between selected chambers, in order to restrict the flow of air between the chambers (26 and 42). The shape and structure of the impedance means (74) determines the nature of the air flow between chambers (26 and 42), such that the cushioning member (10) can be tailored for various types of activities and body weights, by offering varying degrees of cushioning.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 13/20; A43B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 13/00 (2006.01); A43B 13/18 (2006.01); A43B 13/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 13/203 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9520332 A1 19950803; AU 6128194 A 19950815; AU 687382 B2 19980226; CA 2181998 A1 19950803; CA 2181998 C 20030513; DE 69424044 D1 20000525; DE 69424044 T2 20000914; EP 0699035 A1 19960306; EP 0699035 A4 19961016; EP 0699035 B1 20000419; ES 2147782 T3 20001001; JP 3040169 B2 20000508; JP H09508288 A 19970826

INPADOC legal status

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140127

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140128

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140125

2014-04-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140407

2014-02-19 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20140125

2014-01-28 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69424044

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130204

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130207

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120116

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-05-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20110501

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2147782

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-07-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69424044

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-25

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-07-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980528

1996-10-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1996-10-16 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RHK1

- IPC: A43B 13/20

1996-03-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19951019

1996-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT