Global Patent Index - EP 0699400 B1

EP 0699400 B1 2000-03-29 - Safety belt buckle

Title (en)

Safety belt buckle

Title (de)

Verschluss für Sicherheitsgurte

Title (fr)

Boucle pour ceinture de sécurité

Publication

EP 0699400 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95112948 A

Priority

DE 9414029 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CZ287274B6] The present invention relates to a safety belt lock having a rotary plug (16) being fastened in a loaded frame (14) and engaging in its locking position with a latch edge of a sliding tongue (10) with a locking element (20) that is slidably mounted on the frame (14) transversely to the direction of the rotary plug (16) rotation between an open position, in which the plug (16) is released and a securing position in which the rotary plug (16) is interlocked in engaging position, further with a release push-button (24) mounted also on the frame and by the action of which the locking element (20) can be moved to open position and a helical compression spring (30). The helical compression spring (30) one end bears against the rotary plug (16) while the other end (40) thereof bears against the locking element (20) and at the same time it is held in a device for attachment the spring that is defined by the frame (14) partitions (50) and comprises a pin (35) arranged on the locking element (20). The compression spring (30) end (40) outside diameter on the side of the locking element (20) is slightly smaller than the distance between both partitions (50) of the frame (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 11/25

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 11/26 (2006.01); A44B 11/14 (2006.01); A44B 11/25 (2006.01); B60R 22/12 (2006.01); B60R 22/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 11/2523 (2013.01); Y10T 24/45623 (2013.01); Y10T 24/45628 (2013.01); Y10T 24/45634 (2013.01); Y10T 24/45644 (2013.01); Y10T 24/45665 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 9414029 U1 19941020; CN 1127104 A 19960724; CZ 287274 B6 20001011; CZ 9502215 A3 19960313; EP 0699400 A2 19960306; EP 0699400 A3 19970129; EP 0699400 B1 20000329; ES 2085252 T1 19960601; ES 2085252 T3 20000701; JP 2726019 B2 19980311; JP H08280417 A 19961029; US 5598613 A 19970204

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20020911

2003-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030829

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-06-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010817

2001-08-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010818

2001-08-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010817

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20000817

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-08-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000803

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-07-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000703

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2085252 T3

2000-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000515

2000-05-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508083 20000504

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000329

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990318

1998-06-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRW OCCUPANT RESTRAINT SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970418

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1996-06-07 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1996-06-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2085252 T1

1996-04-24 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: DR. ING. A. RACHELI & C.

1996-03-27 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1996-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE