Global Patent Index - EP 0699407 B1

EP 0699407 B1 2000-12-13 - Clamping, garment hanger

Title (en)

Clamping, garment hanger

Title (de)

Klemmbügel für Bekleidungsgegenstände

Title (fr)

Porte-vêtements à pince

Publication

EP 0699407 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95112347 A

Priority

DE 4430752 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5595331A] A clamping coat hanger has a main clamping member with an upper and a lower end, wherein the upper end has a hook for suspending the coat hanger and the lower end has first clamping ribs. A first clamping member has an upper and a lower end wherein the lower end has second clamping ribs and the upper end has a first pressure application location. The main clamping member and the first clamping member are pivotably connected to one another in the area between the upper and the lower ends thereof. The main clamping member and the first clamping member have cooperating pivot members. The cooperating pivot members are pivotable about a pivot axis parallel to a longitudinal extension of the clamping ribs. The pivot members engage behind one another by transversely intersecting the pivot axis. A first elastic element is connected to the clamping members above the pivot axis for forcing the main clamping member and the first clamping member apart and simultaneously forcing the pivot members into engagement such that the clamping ribs clamp a garment therebetween.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 25/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/483 (2013.01); A47G 25/481 (2013.01); Y10T 24/44479 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

US 5595331 A 19970121; CA 2157145 A1 19960301; DE 4430752 C1 19951116; EP 0699407 A1 19960306; EP 0699407 B1 20001213; JP H0870979 A 19960319

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050805

2002-06-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010805

2002-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020301

2001-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-08-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010805

2001-04-12 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-03-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-02-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010126

2001-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508896

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-18

2000-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1998-09-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980803

1996-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960820

1996-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL