Global Patent Index - EP 0699458 B1

EP 0699458 B1 2000-01-19 - Process of fabricating safety strong ski

Title (en)

Process of fabricating safety strong ski

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines starken und zuverlässigen Skis

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un ski solide et fiable

Publication

EP 0699458 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95113630 A

Priority

  • JP 23070494 A
  • JP 26634194 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0699458A2] Components (21/22/23a/23b/25/32) of a ski are assembled in a cavities (29c/29d) of a mold (29) together with an elongated piece (31) of foamable gum substance, and the mold (29) is heated so as to internally produce foam pressing the components (25/32) to the internal surface of the other components (21/22/23a/23b) providing the outer configuration of the ski, thereby economically fabricating the ski without a void.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/12 (2013.01); A63C 5/126 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 3545455 A1 19870702 - ADAMEK JOCHEN

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0699458 A2 19960306; EP 0699458 A3 19960417; EP 0699458 B1 20000119; AT 188879 T 20000215; DE 69514591 D1 20000224; DE 69514591 T2 20000803

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070830

2006-07-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060724

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-07-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060717

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-07-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060706

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-07-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2004-07-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-02-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69514591

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-24

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 188879

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-09-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JAPANA CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-04-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: TCAT

1999-04-02 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

1997-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19961217

1996-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961017

1996-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

1996-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR