Global Patent Index - EP 0699617 B1

EP 0699617 B1 2000-05-24 - Lift installation with identification device

Title (en)

Lift installation with identification device

Title (de)

Aufzugsanlage mit Erkennungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Installation d'ascenseur avec dispositif de reconnaissance

Publication

EP 0699617 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95112271 A

Priority

CH 264594 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0699617A1] The lift system has an input device (5) on each floor for entering the lift calls, with a given algorithm used for controlling the lift so that the calls are dealt with in an efficient order. The input device is positioned at the approach to the lift and cooperates with an information tag (1) carried by the user, for identifying each user, to alow associated information to be supplied to the lift control (10) from a data memory (8). Pref. the input device receives the information from a data memory incorporated in the information tag after transmitting an interrogation signal to the latter, the communication effected via a radio frequency signal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/14 (2006.01); B66B 1/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/468 (2013.01); B66B 2201/4615 (2013.01); B66B 2201/463 (2013.01); B66B 2201/4638 (2013.01); B66B 2201/4661 (2013.01); B66B 2201/4676 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0699617 A1 19960306; EP 0699617 B1 20000524; AT 193273 T 20000615; CA 2156339 A1 19960301; CA 2156339 C 20060328; CH 693065 A5 20030214; CN 1038186 C 19980429; CN 1129667 A 19960828; DE 59508377 D1 20000629; ES 2148383 T3 20001016; FI 112932 B 20040213; FI 954023 A0 19950828; FI 954023 A 19960302; HK 1011332 A1 20001027; JP 2006111455 A 20060427; JP H0881143 A 19960326; US 5689094 A 19971118; ZA 9506075 B 19960227

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150805

2015-11-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151126

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150803

2015-09-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 193273 T

- Effective date: 20150804

2015-08-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150803

2015-08-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-08-12 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20150804

2015-08-04 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59508377

2015-06-03 [REG DE R040] WITHDRAWAL/REFUSAL OF REVOCATION ACTION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59508377

- Effective date: 20150416

2015-04-16 [REG DE R040] WITHDRAWAL/REFUSAL OF REVOCATION ACTION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59508377

2015-04-16 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 59508377

2015-01-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140820

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140828

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140820

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140813

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140826

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140820

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140828

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-09-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20140822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-18 [REG DE R039] REVOCATION ACTION FILED

- Document: DE 59508377

- Effective date: 20121221

2012-12-21 [REG DE R008] CASE PENDING AT FEDERAL PATENT COURT

- Document: DE 59508377

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148383 T3

2000-08-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000620

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508377 20000629

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2000-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193273 T 20000615

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990729

1996-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960819

1996-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL