Global Patent Index - EP 0699618 B1

EP 0699618 B1 2000-04-05 - Clamping device for synthetic fibre cable

Title (en)

Clamping device for synthetic fibre cable

Title (de)

Seilklemmvorrichtung für ein Kunstfaserseil

Title (fr)

Dispositif de serrage pour un câble à fibres synthétiques

Publication

EP 0699618 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95112341 A

Priority

CH 262894 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0699618A1] The clamping device is for an artificial fibre rope, esp. for lifts (3). It has a retainer drum (10) with at least one cut-in rope groove (12) for accommodation of the rope. The retainer drum is fixed to the cabin and/or the counterweight (7) of a lift. On one or more retainer drums several rope grooves (12) are arranged next to one another, the groove threads (16) of which end directly adjacent to each other for the run-out of the rope. The rope grooves in their cross-section from the entry of the loaded rope continually become narrower. Several retainer drums can be arranged in series or next to one another, whereby the run-out areas (13) of the rope grooves point to one another.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/06 (2006.01); B66B 7/08 (2006.01); B66B 11/08 (2006.01); B66D 1/30 (2006.01); B66D 1/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0699618 A1 19960306; EP 0699618 B1 20000405; AT 191430 T 20000415; CA 2154422 A1 19960301; CA 2154422 C 20050524; CN 1036060 C 19971008; CN 1126171 A 19960710; DE 59508121 D1 20000511; DK 0699618 T3 20000904; HK 1011344 A1 20000818; JP 3701059 B2 20050928; JP H0867455 A 19960312; US 5855254 A 19990105

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050725

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060805

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060805

2007-03-26 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-11-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061117

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060805

2005-08-16 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050816

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050812

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-12 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050812

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050812

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-12 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050812

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-07-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050725

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-04 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508121

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-11

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB LI NL

2000-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 191430

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990608

1996-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960819

1996-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB LI NL