Global patent index - EP 0699803 B1

EP 0699803 B1 2000-01-12 - Offshore drilling or production platform with anchoring means

Title (en)

Offshore drilling or production platform with anchoring means

Title (de)

Bohr- oder Produktionsinsel versehen mit Mittel zum Verankern auf dem Meeresboden

Title (fr)

Plate-forme pétrolière de forage ou d'exploitation en mer, pourvue de moyens perfectionnés d'ancrage dans le sol marin

Publication

EP 0699803 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95401898 A

Priority

FR 9410432 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0699803A1] An off-shore drilling platform is mounted on hollow support legs and large circular feet. Piles are mounted in a guide assembly inside each leg. A hydraulic hammer is used to drive the piles through the feet into the seabed. The feet have three drilled protrusions through which two smaller piles are driven to prevent movement during the main pile-driving. A platform shell (1) is supported on three legs (2) with three large circular feet (3). A central disc (4) carries the piles (5) in a guide assembly (14). The piles (5) are driven into the seabed by a hydraulic hammer (8) suspended by a cable (9) from a cage (7). The feet (3) are held in place by smaller piles (12) driven through drilled protrusions (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02B 17/00; E02B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02B 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02B 17/021 (2013.01); E02B 17/0017 (2013.01); E02B 2017/006 (2013.01); E02B 2017/0082 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0699803 A1 19960306; EP 0699803 B1 20000112; BR 9503830 A 19960910; FR 2723975 A1 19960301; FR 2723975 B1 19970214; NO 309990 B1 20010430; NO 953366 A 19960301; NO 953366 D0 19950828; OA 10179 A 19961218; US 5573355 A 19961112

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150815

2015-09-09 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20150815

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140818

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100816

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090820

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-03-31 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20100301

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080815

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-03-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: INVENTION S.N.C.

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): GB IT NL

1999-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: TECHNIP FRANCE

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990219

1996-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960420

1996-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): GB IT NL