Global Patent Index - EP 0699944 B1

EP 0699944 B1 2000-06-07 - Tabular grain emulsions with sensitization enhancements

Title (en)

Tabular grain emulsions with sensitization enhancements

Title (de)

Emulsionen aus tafelförmigen Körnern mit verbesserter Empfindlichkeit

Title (fr)

Emulsions aux grains tabulaires à sensibilité améliorée

Publication

EP 0699944 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95420233 A

Priority

  • US 29743094 A
  • US 29656294 A
  • US 29719594 A
  • US 35925194 A
  • US 44149195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0699944A1] A chemically and spectrally sensitized tabular grain emulsion is disclosed including tabular grains (a) having ä111ü major faces, (b) containing greater than 70 mole percent bromide and at least 0.25 mole percent iodide, based on silver, (c) accounting for greater than 90 percent of total grain projected area, (d) exhibiting an average equivalent circular diameter of at least 0.7 mu m, and (f) exhibiting an average thickness in the range of from less than 0.3 mu m to at least 0.07 mu m. It has been observed that increased speed, lower granularity, increased contrast and faster rates of development can be realized when (1) the tabular grains contain less than 10 mole percent iodide and (2) the surface chemical sensitization sites include epitaxially deposited silver halide protrusions of a face centered cubic crystal lattice structure of the rock salt type forming epitaxial junctions with the tabular grains, the protrusions (a) being restricted to those portions of the tabular grains located nearest peripheral edges of and accounting for less than 50 percent of the ä111ü major faces of the tabular grains, (b) containing a silver chloride concentration at least 10 mole percent higher than that of the tabular grains, and (c) including at least 1 mole percent iodide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/005

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/00 (2006.01); G03C 1/005 (2006.01); G03C 1/015 (2006.01); G03C 1/035 (2006.01); G03C 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/0051 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0699944 A1 19960306; EP 0699944 B1 20000607; DE 69517372 D1 20000713; DE 69517372 T2 20010215; JP H08171164 A 19960702

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050821

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-08-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050821

2004-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-08-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040804

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040707

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517372 20000713

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990702

1996-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960824

1996-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB