Global Patent Index - EP 0699949 B1

EP 0699949 B1 2000-06-07 - Ultrathin tabular grain emulsions with dopants at selected locations

Title (en)

Ultrathin tabular grain emulsions with dopants at selected locations

Title (de)

Emulsionen mit ultradünnen tafelförmigen Körnern und Dotierungsmitteln auf ausgewählten Stellen

Title (fr)

Emulsions aux grains tabulaires ultraminces avec des dopants sur des places sélectionnées

Publication

EP 0699949 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95420238 A

Priority

  • US 29743094 A
  • US 29656294 A
  • US 29719594 A
  • US 35925194 A
  • US 44113295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0699949A1] A chemically and spectrally sensitized ultra-thin tabular grain emulsion is disclosed including tabular grains (a) having ä111ü major faces, (b) containing greater than 70 mole percent bromide, based on silver, (c) accounting for greater than 90 percent of total grain projected area, (d) exhibiting an average equivalent circular diameter of at least 0.7 mu m, and (e) exhibiting an average thickness of less than 0.07 mu m. Improved sensitivity is observed when the surface chemical sensitization sites include silver halide protrusions of a face centered cubic crystal lattice structure forming epitaxial junctions with the tabular grains and having a higher overall solubility than at least that portion of the tabular grains forming epitaxial junctions with the protrusions and a sensitivity enhancing combination of dopants are contained in the silver halide grains including a first sensitivity enhancing dopant capable of providing shallow electron trapping sites and a second sensitivity enhancing selenium dopant. To further enhance sensitivity, one of the sensitivity enhancing dopants is restricted to the tabular grains while the other is restricted to the silver halide epitaxy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/005; G03C 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/035 (2006.01); G03C 1/005 (2006.01); G03C 1/08 (2006.01); G03C 1/09 (2006.01); G03C 1/10 (2006.01); G03C 1/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/0051 (2013.01); G03C 1/08 (2013.01); G03C 1/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0699949 A1 19960306; EP 0699949 B1 20000607; DE 69517373 D1 20000713; DE 69517373 T2 20010208; JP H08101472 A 19960416

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050821

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-08-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050821

2004-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-08-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040804

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040707

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517373 20000713

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990616

1996-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960824

1996-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB