Global Patent Index - EP 0699950 B1

EP 0699950 B1 2000-05-24 - Ultrathin tabular grain emulsions with novel dopant management

Title (en)

Ultrathin tabular grain emulsions with novel dopant management

Title (de)

Emulsionen mit ultradünnen tafelförmigen Körnern und neuer Behandlung von Dotiermitteln

Title (fr)

Emulsions aux grains tabulaires ultraminces avec gestion nouvelle de dopants

Publication

EP 0699950 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95420240 A

Priority

  • US 29743094 A
  • US 29656294 A
  • US 29719594 A
  • US 35925194 A
  • US 44148995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0699950A1] A chemically and spectrally sensitized ultra-thin tabular grain emulsion is disclosed including tabular grains (a) having ä111ü major faces, (b) containing greater than 70 mole percent bromide, based on silver, (c) accounting for greater than 90 percent of total grain projected area, (d) exhibiting an average equivalent circular diameter of at least 0.7 mu m, and (e) exhibiting an average thickness of less than 0.07 mu m. It has been observed that increased speed and contrast as well as improvements in speed-granularity relationships can be realized when the surface chemical sensitization sites include epitaxially deposited silver halide protrusions forming epitaxial junctions with the tabular grains, the protrusions (a) being located on up to 50 percent of the surface area of the tabular grains, (b) having a higher overall solubility than at least that portion of the tabular grains forming epitaxial junctions with the protrusions, and (c) forming a face centered cubic crystal lattice. In further improving photographic performance by incorporating a photographically useful dopants, it has been observed that iridium placed in the ultrathin tabular grains and a shallow electron trapping site providing dopant placed, in the silver halide protrusions can together increase photographic speed and reduce high intensity reciprocity failure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/005; G03C 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/035 (2006.01); G03C 1/005 (2006.01); G03C 1/08 (2006.01); G03C 1/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/0051 (2013.01); G03C 1/08 (2013.01); G03C 1/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0699950 A1 19960306; EP 0699950 B1 20000524; DE 69517109 D1 20000629; DE 69517109 T2 20010201; JP H08171163 A 19960702

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050821

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-08-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050821

2004-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-08-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040804

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040707

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69517109

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-29

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990714

1996-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960824

1996-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB