Global Patent Index - EP 0700037 B1

EP 0700037 B1 2000-03-29 - Information recording medium

Title (en)

Information recording medium

Title (de)

Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium

Title (fr)

Milieu d'enregistrement d'information

Publication

EP 0700037 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95113373 A

Priority

JP 20180794 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0700037A1] An information recording medium includes a transparent substrate, an interference layer formed on the transparent substrate, a recording layer formed on the interference layer, a reflective layer formed on the recording layer, and a coating resin formed on the reflective layer. The recording layer has a pit region and a mirror region. The reflectivity of the pit portion changes as a thickness of the recording layer changes. The reflectivity characteristic of the mirror region is selectively adjustable from that of the pit region within a range of thicknesses of the interference layer. <MATH>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 7/24; G11B 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/241 (2006.01); G11B 7/005 (2006.01); G11B 7/24 (2006.01); G11B 7/257 (2006.01); G11B 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/24 (2013.01); G11B 7/0051 (2013.01); G11B 7/2578 (2013.01); G11B 7/26 (2013.01); G11B 7/2531 (2013.01); G11B 7/2533 (2013.01); G11B 7/2534 (2013.01); G11B 7/254 (2013.01); G11B 7/2585 (2013.01); G11B 7/259 (2013.01); G11B 7/2595 (2013.01); G11B 2007/25706 (2013.01); G11B 2007/2571 (2013.01); G11B 2007/25713 (2013.01); G11B 2007/25715 (2013.01); G11B 2007/25718 (2013.01); Y10S 428/913 (2013.01); Y10S 430/146 (2013.01); Y10T 428/21 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0700037 A1 19960306; EP 0700037 B1 20000329; DE 69515943 D1 20000504; DE 69515943 T2 20000720; JP 3068416 B2 20000724; JP H0863783 A 19960308; US 5591500 A 19970107

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-04-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2003-08-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030825

2002-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020829

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020829

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020821

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515943 20000504

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990115

1996-03-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951222

1996-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL