Global Patent Index - EP 0700058 B1

EP 0700058 B1 2000-02-09 - Process for protection of porous components submitted to high potential differences and components manufactured by this process

Title (en)

Process for protection of porous components submitted to high potential differences and components manufactured by this process

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Schutz von porösen Bauelementen vor hohen Potentialdifferenzen und danach hergestellte Bauelemente

Title (fr)

Procédé de protection de composants poreux soumis à des différences de potentiel élevées et composants ainsi réalisés

Publication

EP 0700058 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95401954 A

Priority

FR 9410410 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0700058A1] The protection method of porous components which are to be subject to large potential differences involves soaking the whole component in a hot bath of polymerisable fluid resin. The resin is polymerised after penetration into all the porous holes formed in the material. Before the soaking process, the fluid is heated under vacuum at a temperature at which it attains the required viscosity to penetrate in the pores of the material. The viscosity of the resin under these conditions is less than or equal to 0.5 Pa.s. The soaking process may be improved by subjecting the heated bath to pressure during the immersion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01C 1/028

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01C 1/028 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01C 1/028 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0700058 A1 19960306; EP 0700058 B1 20000209; DE 69514969 D1 20000316; DE 69514969 T2 20000817; FR 2724044 A1 19960301; FR 2724044 B1 19970103; WO 2004075215 A1 20040902

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050825

2003-04-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020825

2003-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2002-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020825

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-08 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010808

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-07-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010726

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-07-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010724

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-11 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

2000-07-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-04-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69514969 20000316

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

1998-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971113

1997-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961107

1996-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI