Global Patent Index - EP 0700470 B1

EP 0700470 B1 2000-03-22 - PRESSING ARRANGEMENT FOR A MOVING WEB

Title (en)

PRESSING ARRANGEMENT FOR A MOVING WEB

Title (de)

PRESSENANORDNUNG FÜR EINE LAUFENDE MATERIALBAHN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PRESSION POUR BANDE EN DEPLACEMENT

Publication

EP 0700470 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93919793 A

Priority

  • SE 9300730 W
  • SE 9301802 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9428239A1] The invention concerns a pressing arrangement for a moving web (6), comprising a press roll (1) which forms a press zone (7) with a moving elastic belt (5) which is endless and supported by a counter body (2, 9). The outside of the belt is surface finished to a roughness which is more uniform than the side of the web contacting it. The press roll is heated to a temperature of at least 100 DEG C. The arrangement is principally intended for surface finishing of fiber mats such as paper or board. A method is indicated whereby preheating of the web prior to the press zone is achieved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/02; D21G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/48 (2006.01); D21F 1/50 (2006.01); D21F 1/52 (2006.01); D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 9/02 (2006.01); D21G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/006 (2013.01); D21F 3/02 (2013.01); D21F 3/0218 (2013.01); D21F 3/0281 (2013.01); D21G 1/0066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9428239 A1 19941208; AT 191023 T 20000415; BR 9307856 A 19960116; CA 2163532 A1 19941208; DE 69328199 D1 20000427; DE 69328199 T2 20001005; EP 0700470 A1 19960313; EP 0700470 B1 20000322; FI 111090 B 20030530; FI 955672 A0 19951124; FI 955672 A 19951124; JP 2899414 B2 19990602; JP H08510014 A 19961022; PL 171819 B1 19970630; PL 311744 A1 19960318

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69328199

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-05-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69328199

2013-04-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69328199

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110923

- Year of fee payment: 19

2001-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20000908

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000908

2000-08-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69328199 20000427

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191023 T 20000415

1998-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980827

1996-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951120

1996-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE