Global Patent Index - EP 0700473 B1

EP 0700473 B1 2000-04-05 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PAPER

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PAPER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR PAPIERHERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA FABRICATION DU PAPIER

Publication

EP 0700473 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93902274 A

Priority

  • FI 9300019 W
  • FI 920246 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9314263A1] The invention relates to a process for the production of paper by adding to an aqueous fiber suspension, which possibly contains a filler, auxiliary agents for improving retention and/or dewatering, the auxiliary agents being a cationic long-chain polyacrylamide and an aluminum salt, and by dewatering the obtained fiber suspension during the sheet-forming stage. According to the invention, the said aqueous fiber suspension, possibly containing a filler, to which the cationic long-chain polyacrylamide has first been added, is subjected to shearing forces, whereafter there is added to it, directly before sheet forming, a polymeric aluminum salt or an aluminum salt, in which case a base or an acid is added, when necessary, to the said fiber suspension so that the pH be within the range 7-9 before the sheet forming, in which case aluminum hydroxy particles having anionic surface charges will be formed in situ.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 23/76; D21H 21/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 17/44 (2006.01); D21H 17/37 (2006.01); D21H 17/45 (2006.01); D21H 17/55 (2006.01); D21H 17/56 (2006.01); D21H 17/63 (2006.01); D21H 17/65 (2006.01); D21H 17/66 (2006.01); D21H 21/10 (2006.01); D21H 23/14 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

D21H (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/10 (2013.01); D21H 17/375 (2013.01); D21H 17/455 (2013.01); D21H 17/55 (2013.01); D21H 17/56 (2013.01); D21H 17/66 (2013.01); D21H 23/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9314263 A1 19930722; AT 191524 T 20000415; AU 3354193 A 19930803; AU 660066 B2 19950608; CA 2127992 A1 19930722; DE 69328311 D1 20000511; DE 69328311 T2 20000810; DE 69328311 T3 20030731; EP 0700473 A1 19960313; EP 0700473 B1 20000405; EP 0700473 B2 20030122; ES 2146609 T3 20000816; ES 2146609 T5 20030701; FI 920246 A0 19920120; FI 943425 A0 19940719; FI 943425 A 19940719; JP 3138475 B2 20010226; JP H07502791 A 19950323; PT 700473 E 20000731

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KEMIRA OYJ

- Effective date: 20050131

2006-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050121

2005-11-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-10-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-09-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Effective date: 20050720

2005-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050120

2005-08-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KEMIRA OYJ

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-07-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050720

2005-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050121

2005-01-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050121

2005-01-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050120

2005-01-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050120

2005-01-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050120

2005-01-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-08-31 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Free text: KEMIRA OYJ FI

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-08-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: KEMIRA OYJ

2004-07-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2004-07-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-05-14 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KEMIRA OYJ

- Free text: KEMIRA CHEMICALS OY#P.O. BOX 330#00101 HELSINKI (FI) -TRANSFER TO- KEMIRA OYJ#PORKKALANKATU 3#00180 HELSINKI (FI)

2004-01-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040115

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-01-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040107

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-12-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031218

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-12-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031215

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-12-15 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20031215

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-12-12 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031212

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-12-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031212

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-12-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031211

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-12-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031208

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-12-04 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031204

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-07-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2003-06-27 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2003-04-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-02-14 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2003-01-22 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 21H 23/76 A, 7D 21H 21/10 B

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-14 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: EKA CHEMICALS AB

2001-02-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: EKA CHEMICALS AB

- Effective date: 20001228

2001-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-01-22 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010122

2001-01-20 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010120

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146609 T3

2000-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-07-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69328311 20000511

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: LUPPI & CRUGNOLA

2000-04-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUECHEL, VON REVY & PARTNER

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191524 T 20000415

1999-09-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KEMIRA CHEMICALS OY

1997-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970707

1996-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940808

1996-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE