Global Patent Index - EP 0700511 A4

EP 0700511 A4 2000-02-23 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE SIZE OF PARTICLES USING LIGHT SCATTERING

Title (en)

APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE SIZE OF PARTICLES USING LIGHT SCATTERING

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER TEILCHENGRÖSSE MITTELS LICHTSTREUUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DE LA TAILLE DE PARTICULES EN UTILISANT LA DIFFUSION DE LUMIERE

Publication

EP 0700511 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 94920043 A

Priority

  • US 9405968 W
  • US 6730793 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9428392A1] An apparatus and method are disclosed which allow the size of a particle (20) suspended in a medium to be determined virtually independent of the materials' refractive index. The apparatus includes a means (12) for producing a beam of collimated light (22), a means (13) for exposing the particles (20) to the collimated light (22), thereby scattering the light, a detector (14, 31), and a means (17, 41, 43) for preventing any of the light which was scattered by the particles (20) from reaching the detector (14, 31). The method of the invention comprises passing the medium containing the particle (20) through a beam of collimated light (22), so that the light which contacts the particle (20) will be scattered; deterring the light which was scattered by the particles (20) from being detected; detecting the light which was not scattered by the particle, and determining the size of the particle (20) from the decrease in the light intensity incident on the detector (14, 31).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 15/02; G01N 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 11/08 (2006.01); G01N 15/02 (2006.01); G01N 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 15/0205 (2013.01); G01N 2021/4707 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 4966462 A 19901030 - NOVICK VINCENT J [US]
  • [A] US 4890920 A 19900102 - NIZIOLEK JAMES M [US], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 005, no. 048 (P - 055) 7 April 1981 (1981-04-07)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 096 (P - 1322) 10 March 1992 (1992-03-10)
  • See also references of WO 9428392A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9428392 A1 19941208; AU 7096594 A 19941220; CA 2163555 A1 19941208; EP 0700511 A1 19960313; EP 0700511 A4 20000223; JP H08510839 A 19961112; US 5859705 A 19990112

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050128

2000-02-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-11-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY

1996-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951123

1996-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT