Global Patent Index - EP 0700729 B1

EP 0700729 B1 2000-02-09 - Easily cleanable shower head

Title (en)

Easily cleanable shower head

Title (de)

Leicht zu reinigender Brausekopf

Title (fr)

Pomme de douche facile à nettoyer

Publication

EP 0700729 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95112664 A

Priority

DE 4432327 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0700729A1] The base plate (4) of a shower head has a number of rows (15, 16) of water jets (5-7). Their outlet openings (10) have an upwards curvature (12) in the water outlet direction (11). The base plate (4) or ring disc is of a plastics, and pref. TPE, with a Shore hardness of about 90.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 1/18; B05B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/28 (2006.01); B05B 1/18 (2006.01); B05B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/185 (2013.01); B05B 15/50 (2018.02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0700729 A1 19960313; EP 0700729 B1 20000209; AT 189623 T 20000215; CZ 9502042 A3 19960313; DE 4432327 A1 19960314; DE 4432327 C2 19980702; DK 0700729 T3 20000724; ES 2144549 T3 20000616; HU 215677 B 19990201; HU 9502060 D0 19950928; HU T72377 A 19960429; PL 177778 B1 20000131; PL 310309 A1 19960318

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2003-10-01 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-06-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-04-07 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2003-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2002-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020812

2002-08-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020811

2001-09-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010912

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010831

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010829

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-08-27 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20010827

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-08-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010821

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-07-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010711

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-07-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010710

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-06-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: DAS PATENT IST AUFGRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 14.05.2001 * DAS PATENT IST AUFGRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 14.05.2001

2001-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO * SCHMAU

2001-04-12 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-04-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20000811

2001-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: FRIEDRICH GROHE AG & CO. KG

2001-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FRANZ SCHEFFER OHG

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-12-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FRIEDRICH GROHE AG & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000811

2000-08-11 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000811

2000-07-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144549 T3

2000-05-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-05-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-05-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-03-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Free text: ERRATUM: THE FOLLOWING EUROPEAN PATENTS WERE ADVERTISED IN ERROR IN JOURNAL 5781 DATED 1 MARCH 2000 AS HAVING BEEN FILED UNDER SECTION 77(6)(A) ON 8 FEBRUARY 2000.

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507772 20000316

2000-03-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189623 T 20000215

1998-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981015

1996-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960622

1996-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE