Global Patent Index - EP 0700755 B1

EP 0700755 B1 2000-04-05 - Retaining device for a set of wrenches

Title (en)

Retaining device for a set of wrenches

Title (de)

Aufnahmevorrichtung für einen Satz Schraubenschüssel

Title (fr)

Dispositif de logement pour un ensemble de clés

Publication

EP 0700755 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95113857 A

Priority

LU 88529 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0700755A1] The holder comprises a one-piece block with several parallel holder slots, each for the shaft of one spanner (12,14). Each slot is formed by an elastic element (42) and a rigid support (38). When a spanner is pushed into the slot, the element is moved away from the support, and tensioned. It applies a spring force in direction of the support to the spanner shaft. The elastic element may consist of an elastic tongue with a press-down bump (44). The support can have two separate support bumps (46',46") for the shaft. All bumps may be rounded or angled to form a wedge-shaped gap into which the spanner shaft can be pressed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25H 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25H 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25H 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0700755 A1 19960313; EP 0700755 B1 20000405; AT 191388 T 20000415; DE 59508122 D1 20000511; LU 88529 A1 19960318

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150903

2015-09-23 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20150903

2015-09-04 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59508122

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-03-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59508122

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: OFFICE FREYLINGER S.A., LU

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140617

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140702

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140617

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. PROXXON

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20000930

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000904

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508122

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-11

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-04-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 191388

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1997-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970213

1996-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960621

1996-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE