Global patent index - EP 0700782 B1

EP 0700782 B1 2000-01-19 - Damping unit of an offset printing machine

Title (en)

Damping unit of an offset printing machine

Title (de)

Feuchtwerk einer Offsetrotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mouillage d'une machine à imprimer offset

Publication

EP 0700782 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95113647 A

Priority

DE 4431646 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0700782A2] The moisture dosing of the process roller is via a pickup roller (3) partially in the fluid reservoir and transferring a controlled feed to an applicator roller (2) in contact with the process roller (1). A pressure roller (4) in variable contact with the pickup roller controls the rate of pickup which is measured by a thickness monitor (22) with feedback control for the roller position mountings. These have mounting arms (7, 11) moved by servo motors (12, 16). The processor control (18) monitors the measured signals and adjusts the main mounting arm (7) to vary the contact between the pickup roller and applicator roller. The pressure roller has an adjuster arm (11) with an eccentric axle mounting (8, 9) to vary the pressure onto the pickup roller.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 33/00; B41F 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/26 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/0054 (2013.01); B41F 7/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4431646 A1 19960307; EP 0700782 A2 19960313; EP 0700782 A3 19970312; EP 0700782 B1 20000119

INPADOC legal status

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080929

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-09-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2004-05-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-09-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-06-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020831

2003-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-20 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020820

- Year of fee payment: 08

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-04 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010904

- Year of fee payment: 07

2001-08-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010820

- Year of fee payment: 07

2001-07-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010725

- Year of fee payment: 07

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000313

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59507633

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000224

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-01-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-06-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: DAMPING UNIT OF AN OFFSET PRINTING MACHINE

1998-12-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1998-08-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980617

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970904

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1997-03-05 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41F 33/00

1996-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE CH DE FR GB IT LI SE