Global patent index - EP 0701022 B1

EP 0701022 B1 2001-04-04 - Coating machine for applying directly or indirectly a fluid or pasty material onto a moving web

Title (en)

Coating machine for applying directly or indirectly a fluid or pasty material onto a moving web

Title (de)

Auftragswerk zum direkten oder indirekten Auftragen eines flüssigen oder pastösen Mediums auf eine laufende Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Appareil d'enduction pour déposer directement ou indirectement un matériau fluide ou pâteux sur une bande en mouvement

Publication

EP 0701022 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95113027 A

Priority

  • DE 4432177 A
  • DE 19514772 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0701022A2] Coating machine for the direct or indirect application of fluid or pasty medium (6) to a running web, esp. paper or cardboard, has a dosing slot (4) to form an impulse jet between a discharge lip (3) and a lip (2) near the application point and an adjuster (20-25) which is set in zones along the machine length for adjusting the distance of the application point lip from the discharge lip.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 23/32; D21H 23/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/04 (2006.01); B05C 1/08 (2006.01); B05C 3/18 (2006.01); B05C 5/02 (2006.01); D21H 23/32 (2006.01); D21H 23/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 23/32 (2013.01); B05C 1/0817 (2013.01); B05C 5/0283 (2013.01); D21H 23/56 (2013.01); B05C 5/0262 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0701022 A2 19960313; EP 0701022 A3 19970514; EP 0701022 B1 20010404; AT 200325 T 20010415; BR 9504624 A 19961008; CA 2157832 A1 19960310; CA 2157832 C 20070522; FI 109769 B 20021015; FI 954216 A0 19950908; FI 954216 A 19960310; JP H08173880 A 19960709; US 5785253 A 19980728

INPADOC legal status

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59509152

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120818

2013-05-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120819

2013-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 200325

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120818

2013-04-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110823

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110901

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110812

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-10-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59509152

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-10

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-04-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200325

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-01-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-08-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980703

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970617

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

1996-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE