Global Patent Index - EP 0701226 B1

EP 0701226 B1 2001-03-21 - Method for segmenting handwritten lines of text in a scanned image

Title (en)

Method for segmenting handwritten lines of text in a scanned image

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Segmentierung handgeschriebener Linien auf einem abgetasten Bild

Title (fr)

Méthode pour segmenter des lignes de texte manuscriptes sur une image scannée

Publication

EP 0701226 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95306118 A

Priority

US 30396294 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0701226A2] Image analysis techniques supporting the determination of spatial areas including segmenting textual areas (Figs 7,9) into particular lines of text are disclosed, in which a line height and position is estimated (380) based on a first token. Each succeeding rightward token is analyzed (382-386) according to its proximity to the current line position estimate. Tokens whose vertical position are within a desired proximity (392) to the position of the line are accepted (398) as part of the line, and a new line estimate is made (399) before proceeding to the next token. Questionable tokens, which are near but not within the desired proximity, are accepted (388) if they touch an accepted token. <MATH>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 9/34; G06K 9/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 9/20 (2006.01); G06F 3/14 (2006.01); G06K 9/32 (2006.01); G06T 11/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 9/32 (2013.01); G06K 2209/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0701226 A2 19960313; EP 0701226 A3 19970514; EP 0701226 B1 20010321; DE 69520396 D1 20010426; DE 69520396 T2 20010830; JP 3781810 B2 20060531; JP H08101883 A 19960416

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-09-23 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20150831

2015-09-01 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69520396

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69520396

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-26

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971229

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971114

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB