Global Patent Index - EP 0701309 B1

EP 0701309 B1 2001-12-19 - Semiconductor laser diode

Title (en)

Semiconductor laser diode

Title (de)

Halbleiterlaserdiode

Title (fr)

Laser à diode à semi-conducteur

Publication

EP 0701309 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95113765 A

Priority

JP 21009794 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0701309A2] A semiconductor laser diode which can be applied to optical fiber amplifiers to attain a high reliability and can generate light having a wavelength of about 1 mu m is provided. This semiconductor laser diode is formed on a GaAs substrate and has an active layer comprising a GaInAsP strained quantum well whose energy band gap is smaller than that of GaAs. Barrier layers each comprising GaInAsP whose band gap is greater than that of the active layer are bonded to the active layer through heterojunction. According to this structure, when the active layer and the barrier layers are grown, the amounts of supply of a Ga material and an In material can be controlled in a simple manner and a semiconductor laser diode having a high reliability can be realized. <MATH>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01S 5/32; H01L 33/00; H01S 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01S 5/00 (2006.01); B82Y 20/00 (2011.01); H01S 5/16 (2006.01); H01S 5/343 (2006.01); H01S 5/20 (2006.01); H01S 5/223 (2006.01); H01S 5/32 (2006.01); H01S 5/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01S 5/34313 (2013.01); B82Y 20/00 (2013.01); H01S 5/164 (2013.01); H01S 5/343 (2013.01); H01S 5/2009 (2013.01); H01S 5/2231 (2013.01); H01S 5/3211 (2013.01); H01S 5/3406 (2013.01); H01S 2302/00 (2013.01); H01S 2304/02 (2013.01); H01S 2304/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0701309 A2 19960313; EP 0701309 A3 19960508; EP 0701309 B1 20011219; DE 69524693 D1 20020131; DE 69524693 T2 20020718; JP H0878771 A 19960322; US 5734671 A 19980331

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69524693

- Effective date: 20110401

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-04-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2003-09-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030909

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030827

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69524693 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01S 5/32 A, 7H 01L 33/00 B, 7H 01S 5/10 B

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01S 5/32 A, 7H 01L 33/00 B, 7H 01S 5/10 B

1998-04-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980223

1996-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960605

1996-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB