Global Patent Index - EP 0701595 B1

EP 0701595 B1 2000-12-27 - REMOVAL OF SULFUR COMPOUNDS FROM HYDROCARBON STREAMS WHICH CONTAIN A MAJOR PROPORTION OF REACTIVE UNSATURATES

Title (en)

REMOVAL OF SULFUR COMPOUNDS FROM HYDROCARBON STREAMS WHICH CONTAIN A MAJOR PROPORTION OF REACTIVE UNSATURATES

Title (de)

ENTFERNUNG VON SCHWEFELENHALTENDEN VERBINDUNGEN AUS REAKTIVEN KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN DIE UEBERWIEGEND UNGESAELTIGTEN VERBINDUNGEN ENTHALTEN

Title (fr)

ELIMINATION DE COMPOSES SOUFRES D' HYDROCARBURES CONTENANT EN MAJORITE DES COMPOSES INSATURES REACTIFS

Publication

EP 0701595 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94919268 A

Priority

  • US 9405994 W
  • US 6894293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9428089A1] Sulfur and mercaptans in hydrocarbon streams comprising reactive unsaturates are removed by contacting the hydrocarbon stream at mild temperatures with a hydrogen reduced metal oxide, such as copper, zinc and/or aluminum oxide, without the undesirable byproduct reaction of oligomerization or polymerization of the reactive unsaturates.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 29/04 (2006.01); C10G 25/00 (2006.01); C10G 29/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 25/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9428089 A1 19941208; AU 679759 B2 19970710; AU 7046994 A 19941220; CA 2163866 A1 19941208; CA 2163866 C 20050301; DE 69426493 D1 20010201; DE 69426493 T2 20010809; EP 0701595 A1 19960320; EP 0701595 B1 20001227; ES 2154678 T3 20010416; JP 3637569 B2 20050413; JP H08511813 A 19961210; SG 49007 A1 19980518

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080527

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070528

2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2008-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070528

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070528

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070527

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070527

2008-01-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070519

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC.

- Effective date: 20070531

2006-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-05-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060522

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-05-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060504

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-04-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060424

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-04-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060406

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-05-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050517

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL CHEMICAL PATENTS INC.

2001-05-30 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL CHEMICAL PATENTS INC.

2001-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154678 T3

2001-03-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2001-03-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69426493 20010201

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-04-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: REMOVAL OF SULFUR COMPOUNDS FROM HYDROCARBON STREAMS WHICH CONTAIN A MAJOR PROPORTION OF REACTIVE UNSATURATES

1999-11-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: REMOVAL OF SULFUR COMPOUNDS FROM HYDROCARBON STREAMS WHICH CONTAIN A MAJOR PROPORTION OF REACTIVE UNSATURATES

1996-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960404

1996-03-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951222

1996-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE