Global Patent Index - EP 0701957 B1

EP 0701957 B1 2000-07-12 - Device for winding and unwinding flat printed products

Title (en)

Device for winding and unwinding flat printed products

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Auf- und Abwickeln von flachen Druckprodukten

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour enrouler et dérouler des produits imprimés plats

Publication

EP 0701957 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95810544 A

Priority

CH 279594 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0701957A1] The reel hub (2) positioned in a stand (3) has fed to it at least one band (10) which is undershot to the hub and wound off from a winding spindle possessing a parallel turning axis. The hub and stand are jointly driven. The winding spindle of the winding band is removably mounted in the stand. The stand has two laterally spaced apart plate (4) forming the reel's hub (7). The bearing holding the spindle of the band is positioned in the lower side of the stand and is formed by slots open at one end.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/00; B65H 5/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/28 (2006.01); B65H 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/006 (2013.01); B65H 5/28 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4191 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41922 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1932 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0701957 A1 19960320; EP 0701957 B1 20000712; CH 688736 A5 19980213; DE 59508555 D1 20000817; US 5671896 A 19970930

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130904

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130904

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130904

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59508555

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121011

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110915

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ZANELLA & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000804

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508555 20000817

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991112

1996-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960711

1996-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT