Global Patent Index - EP 0702137 B1

EP 0702137 B1 2001-12-19 - Method and apparatus for adjusting the idling speed of a combustion engine

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for adjusting the idling speed of a combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Leerlaufeinstellung einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour ajuster le ralenti d'un moteur à combustion

Publication

EP 0702137 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95112418 A

Priority

DE 4433300 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: JPH08114145A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To control the idling of internal combustion engines always appropriately by correctively increasing the engine idling speed when a hot engine operation state has been established from the oil temperature found above an oil temperature threshold value. SOLUTION: A control unit 10 for controlling an operating element 14 for adjusting idling air passes the signals measuring devices 26, 30 and 34 output after detecting the engine temperature, intake air temperature and engine speed into a target value forming unit 36 and a plurality of threshold stages 48, 50, 52, 54, 56, 58, 72 and 74. The output of an AND gate 82 and an OR gate 96 receiving as inputs the output signals of the threshold stages 48, 50, 52, 54, 56, 58, 72 and 74 changes over a switch 40 via an FF 88 to increase the engine idling speed correctively. A hot engine state, when the idling speed is in that way increased, is present when the engine temperature and intake air temperature have exceeded predetermined threshold values and the engine speed has been above a limit speed, all triggering a lower oil pressure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/20 (2006.01); F02D 41/08 (2006.01); F02D 41/16 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/086 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 4433300 C1 19951109; EP 0702137 A2 19960320; EP 0702137 A3 19980916; EP 0702137 B1 20011219; ES 2170113 T3 20020801; JP H08114145 A 19960507; US 5605128 A 19970225

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090809

2010-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090810

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080828

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2005-08-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050808

2004-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040819

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170113 T3

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010409

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990316

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

1996-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT