Global Patent Index - EP 0702394 B1

EP 0702394 B1 2000-01-05 - Metal halide high pressure discharge lamp

Title (en)

Metal halide high pressure discharge lamp

Title (de)

Metallhalogenid-Hochdruckentladungslampe

Title (fr)

Lampe à décharge haute pression à halogénure métallique

Publication

EP 0702394 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95112860 A

Priority

DE 4432611 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0702394A2] The lamp has a discharge envelope with 2 opposing electrodes and an ionisable filling comprising at least one inert gas, Hg, at least one halogen and the elements Tl, Cs and Hf, for forming halogenides. The Hf can be fully or partially replaced by Zr, or by one or both of the rare earth metals Dy and Gd. Pref. the molecular ratio between the filling component of Hf or Zr and the sum of the rare earth metal filling components is at least 0.35 and pref. between 0.5 and 1.5.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/12; H01J 61/14; H01J 61/34; H01J 61/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/12 (2006.01); H01J 61/14 (2006.01); H01J 61/20 (2006.01); H01J 61/24 (2006.01); H01J 61/26 (2006.01); H01J 61/34 (2006.01); H01J 61/82 (2006.01); H01J 61/86 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/26 (2013.01); H01J 61/12 (2013.01); H01J 61/125 (2013.01); H01J 61/14 (2013.01); H01J 61/34 (2013.01); H01J 61/827 (2013.01); H01J 61/86 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0702394 A2 19960320; EP 0702394 A3 19980429; EP 0702394 B1 20000105; CA 2156472 A1 19960315; DE 4432611 A1 19960321; JP H0896748 A 19960412

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050816

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-05-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030816

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PATENT-TREUHAND-G.- FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUHLAMPEN M.

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030816

2002-10-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021021

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020829

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020820

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020813

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020808

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000309

2000-03-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507563 20000210

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990315

1998-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980608

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

1996-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL