Global Patent Index - EP 0702430 B1

EP 0702430 B1 2000-03-15 - Polarized terminals and electrical connector comprising such terminals

Title (en)

Polarized terminals and electrical connector comprising such terminals

Title (de)

Polarisierte Anschlussbuchsen und elektrischer Verbinder mit derartigen Buchsen

Title (fr)

Bornes polarisées et connecteur électrique comprenant de telles bornes

Publication

EP 0702430 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95114234 A

Priority

FR 9411087 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0702430A2] A connector (2) comprises an insulative housing (4) having a plurality of cavities (6) extending therethrough for receiving stamped and formed terminals (8) therein. The terminals (8) have a U-shaped base section comprising a base wall (20) and side walls (22,24). One of the side walls comprises an upper polarizing extension (71) and the other side wall comprises a lower polarizing extension (72) disposed substantially diagonally from the upper extension. The diagonally opposed polarizing extensions (71,72) allow 0 or 180 DEG polarization of the terminals (8) for insertion into the cavity (6). Due to positioning of the polarizing extensions proximate corners of the cavity, they abut against sturdier and less flexible corner wall sections of the housing when incorrectly inserted, and due to the use of two opposed extensions (71,72) the extensions can be made more compact. The latter also allows close centerline to centerline configuration of the terminals due to the rhombic shape of the cavities that allow maintenance of a minimum and substantially constant wall thickness (90) between adjacent cavities. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/64; H01R 13/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/18 (2006.01); H01R 43/20 (2006.01); H01R 13/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/20 (2013.01); H01R 13/18 (2013.01); H01R 13/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0702430 A2 19960320; EP 0702430 A3 19971022; EP 0702430 B1 20000315; DE 69515582 D1 20000420; DE 69515582 T2 20000914; FR 2724774 A1 19960322

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140917

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2004-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040930

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-09-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030911

2002-08-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020808

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515582 20000420

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990628

1999-06-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: POLARIZED TERMINALS AND ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR COMPRISING SUCH TERMINALS

1998-04-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980226

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1996-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE