Global Patent Index - EP 0702508 B1

EP 0702508 B1 2000-02-02 - Electronic ballast with fuzzy-logic for gas-discharge lamps

Title (en)

Electronic ballast with fuzzy-logic for gas-discharge lamps

Title (de)

Elektronisches Vorschaltgerät für Gasentladungslampen mit unscharfer Logik

Title (fr)

Ballast électronique à logique floue pour lampes à décharge

Publication

EP 0702508 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95114572 A

Priority

  • DE 4433085 A
  • DE 4443784 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0702508A1] The electronic bias circuit has a rectifier (2) for rectifying the supply voltage, coupled to a current converter (3), in turn coupled to a load circuit (4) for supplying at least one gas discharge lamp (5). The brightness of the lamp is controlled via a regulation device (6, 7) with a fuzzy regulator (7), providing an outlet signal determining the setting value of at least one physical operating parameter of the current converter or the load circuit, in dependence on at least one input signal. Pref. the fuzzy regulator is supplied with a difference value obtained by comparing the actual operating current of the lamp with the required lamp operating current and is used for regulating the pulse ratio or frequency of the lamp current.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/36; H05B 37/02; H05B 41/392

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/36 (2006.01); H05B 41/392 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/36 (2013.01); H05B 41/392 (2013.01); Y10S 315/04 (2013.01); Y10S 315/07 (2013.01); Y10S 706/90 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0702508 A1 19960320; EP 0702508 B1 20000202; AT 189573 T 20000215; ES 2144081 T3 20000601; FI 111792 B 20030915; FI 954289 A0 19950913; FI 954289 A 19960317; US 5600211 A 19970204

INPADOC legal status


2015-09-15 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59507726

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130915

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120916

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130915

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130916

2014-04-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-10-22 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131022

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120915

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121001

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120927

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121017

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111028

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110922

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100915

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-04-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110401

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090921

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090921

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE GMBH

- Free text: TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE GMBH#SCHMELZHUETTERSTRASSE 34#6850 DORNBIRN (AT) -TRANSFER TO- TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE GMBH#SCHMELZHUETTERSTRASSE 34#6850 DORNBIRN (AT)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144081 T3

2000-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-04-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507726 20000309

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2000-02-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189573 T 20000215

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990319

1996-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960425

1996-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE