Global Patent Index - EP 0702736 B1

EP 0702736 B1 2000-03-08 - WATERLESS SELF-EMULSIFIABLE BIODEGRADABLE CHEMICAL SOFTENING COMPOSITION USEFUL IN FIBROUS CELLULOSIC MATERIALS

Title (en)

WATERLESS SELF-EMULSIFIABLE BIODEGRADABLE CHEMICAL SOFTENING COMPOSITION USEFUL IN FIBROUS CELLULOSIC MATERIALS

Title (de)

WASSERFREI SELBSTEMULGIERBARE BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE CHEMISCHE WEICHMACHENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ANWENDBAR IN FASERIGEN ZELLULOSEMATERIALIEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION D'ADOUCISSANT CHIMIQUE AUTOEMULSIFIANT ET BIODEGRADABLE SANS EAU POUR PRODUITS CELLULOSIQUES FIBREUX

Publication

EP 0702736 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94920030 A

Priority

  • US 9405778 W
  • US 7229793 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9429521A1] Substantially waterless self-emulsifiable biodegradable chemical softening compositions are provided comprising a mixture of an ester-functional quaternary ammonium compound and a polyhydroxy compound. Preferred biodegradable ester-functional quaternary ammonium compounds include diesterdialkyl dimethyl ammonium salts such as diester ditallow dimethyl ammonium chloride, diester di(touch hydrogenated)tallow dimethyl ammonium chloride and diester di(hydrogenated)tallow dimethyl ammonium chloride. Preferred polyhydroxy compounds are selected from the group consisting of glycerol, polyglycerols having a weight average molecular weight from about 150 to about 800 and polyoxyethylene glycols and polyoxypropylene glycols having a weight average molecular weight from about 200 to about 4000. The substantially waterless self-emulsifiable biodegradable chemical softening compositions are prepared by mixing the ester-functional quaternary ammonium compound with the polyhydroxy compound at a specific temperature range wherein the polyhydroxy compound is miscible with the ester-functional quaternary ammonium compound. The resulting stable solid or concentrated fluid mixture can then be economically shipped to the consumer or ultimate user. The ultimate users of the chemical softening composition simply dilute the mixture with a liquid carrier (e.g., water) to form an aqueous dispersion suitable for treating fibrous cellulosic material. The substantially waterless self-emulsifiable biodegradable chemical softening compositions disclosed herein are primarily intended for softening disposable paper products such as tissues and towels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 17/06; D21H 17/07; D21H 17/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 19/10 (2006.01); D21H 17/06 (2006.01); D21H 17/07 (2006.01); D21H 17/14 (2006.01); D21H 17/53 (2006.01); D21H 21/22 (2006.01); D21H 27/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 27/30 (2013.01); D21H 17/06 (2013.01); D21H 17/07 (2013.01); D21H 17/14 (2013.01); D21H 21/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9429521 A1 19941222; AT 190369 T 20000315; AU 694739 B2 19980730; AU 7095894 A 19950103; BR 9406786 A 19960130; CA 2162850 A1 19941222; CZ 9503212 A3 19960717; DE 69423353 D1 20000413; DE 69423353 T2 20001012; DK 0702736 T3 20000605; EG 20526 A 19990630; EP 0702736 A1 19960327; EP 0702736 B1 20000308; ES 2142947 T3 20000501; FI 955790 A0 19951201; FI 955790 A 19960123; GR 3032823 T3 20000630; HK 1016022 A1 20001124; HU 9503465 D0 19960129; HU T74117 A 19961128; JP 3428650 B2 20030722; JP H08511069 A 19961119; NO 954869 A 19960202; NO 954869 D0 19951130; NZ 268169 A 19971124; PE 53794 A1 19950102; PH 31546 A 19981103; PT 702736 E 20000831; SG 66293 A1 19990720; TR 27810 A 19950829; TW 251324 B 19950711

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110523

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110523

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69423353

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100401

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100531

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040524

2005-05-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050523

2005-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-28 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-05-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040524

2003-05-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030523

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-05-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030506

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-04-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030403

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-03-28 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2002-03-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-01-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2002-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE CY

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-06-22 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-06-22 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-06-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20000621

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-06-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20000620

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-06-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20000531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-05-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-05-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142947 T3

2000-04-26 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20000426

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-04-18 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20000418

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423353 20000413

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-24 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20000324

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & SEIFERT

2000-03-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20000315

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190369 T 20000315

1996-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960326

1996-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951201

1996-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE