Global Patent Index - EP 0702768 B1

EP 0702768 B1 2002-11-06 - LIGHT, AUDIO AND CURRENT RELATED ASSEMBLIES, ATTACHMENTS AND DEVICES WITH CONDUCTIVE COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

LIGHT, AUDIO AND CURRENT RELATED ASSEMBLIES, ATTACHMENTS AND DEVICES WITH CONDUCTIVE COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

LICHT, AUDIO UND STROMÄHNLICHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, BEFESTIGUNGEN UND VORRICHTUNGEN MIT LEITBAREN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLES, ACCESSOIRES ET DISPOSITIFS LUMINEUX, AUDIO ET FONCTIONNANT AVEC DU COURANT PRESENTANT DES COMPOSITIONS CONDUCTRICES

Publication

EP 0702768 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94919220 A

Priority

  • US 9405829 W
  • US 6919693 A
  • US 22935994 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9428348A1] Generally improved current related assemblies, attachment and devices have at least one current operated module (34a-34d) with means preferably for removably affixing said at least one current operated module (34a-34d) in a predetermined position on apparel (31), objects and things, battery pack means (43) to provide electrical power for operating said at least one current operated module (34a-34d), control means (43) operatively associated with said battery pack means (43) for controlling the operation of said at least one current operated module (34a-34d), and an improved and modified conductive composition (39a, 40a, 41c, 42c) including, a metallic mixture having silver and a plastisol to provide high conducting and low surface resistivity, printed, screened, painted, coated on or molded into said apparel (31), objects and things including, connecting means (44) for removably connecting the deposited conductive composition (39a, 40a, 41c, 42c) to the at least one current operated module (34a-34d) and to the battery pack means and control means (43) to establish a current and signal flow path therebetween.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 21/00; A63H 33/04; H01B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/00 (2006.01); A41D 1/00 (2006.01); A41D 27/08 (2006.01); A63H 33/04 (2006.01); A63H 33/26 (2006.01); F21V 21/00 (2006.01); F21V 33/00 (2006.01); G09F 9/00 (2006.01); G09F 13/20 (2006.01); H01B 1/20 (2006.01); F21V 21/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 1/005 (2013.01); A41D 27/08 (2013.01); A41D 27/085 (2013.01); F21V 33/0056 (2013.01); F21V 21/08 (2013.01); F21Y 2115/10 (2016.08)

Citation (examination)

US 5041326 A 19910820 - SCHROEDER BECKY J [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9428348 A1 19941208; AT 227407 T 20021115; AU 689112 B2 19980326; AU 7044094 A 19941220; CA 2162581 A1 19941208; CA 2162581 C 19990824; CN 1097194 C 20021225; CN 1124997 A 19960619; DE 69431657 D1 20021212; DE 69431657 T2 20030717; EP 0702768 A1 19960327; EP 0702768 A4 19970507; EP 0702768 B1 20021106; ES 2188615 T3 20030701; JP 2003177688 A 20030627; JP 3645567 B2 20050511; JP H08511354 A 19961126

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140525

2014-09-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140926

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140527

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140523

2014-06-18 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20140523

2014-05-27 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69431657

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130520

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130531

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130425

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130531

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120518

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100525

2011-02-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090507

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-03-10 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188615 T3

2003-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-26 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030526

2003-05-24 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030524

2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-02-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030206

2003-02-06 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030206

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69431657 20021212

2002-11-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227407 T 20021115

2002-11-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 21/00 A, 7A 63H 33/04 B, 7H 01B 1/00 B

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990730

1997-05-07 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19970319

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1996-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951127

1996-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE