Global Patent Index - EP 0702853 A4

EP 0702853 A4 2000-10-04 - CONNECTOR APPARATUS

Title (en)

CONNECTOR APPARATUS

Title (de)

VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL CONNECTEUR

Publication

EP 0702853 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 94917985 A

Priority

  • JP 11187993 A
  • JP 25989993 A
  • JP 6389494 A
  • US 9405399 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9427343A1] A connector apparatus for a card-like data processing medium comprises a frame (12) having opposing side walls (16a, 16b) that define a storage space (24a, 24b) of the connector apparatus. One end of the frame (12) defines an insertion inlet (22) for inserting a card-like data processing medium (30) in the storage space. A header containing a terminal array (32) is coupled to the end of the frame opposite the insertion inlet (22). An ejection mechanism (40a, 40b) is provided for ejecting the card-like data processing medium (30) from the storage space by manual operation of a push rod (48) that is coupled to the ejection mechanism (40). Means responsive to a control signal are provided for automatically decoupling the push rod (48) from the ejection mechanism to desable the ejection mechanism.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 13/08; G06K 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 17/00 (2006.01); G06K 7/00 (2006.01); G06K 13/08 (2006.01); H01R 13/629 (2006.01); H01R 13/633 (2006.01); H01R 13/639 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 13/0806 (2013.01); G06K 7/0047 (2013.01); G06K 13/08 (2013.01); H01R 13/633 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9427343 A1 19941124; EP 0702853 A1 19960327; EP 0702853 A4 20001004; JP 3657016 B2 20050608; JP H07168919 A 19950704; SG 46651 A1 19980220

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-13 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020621

2001-08-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06K 13/08 A, 7G 06K 7/00 B

2001-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001121

2000-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06K 13/08 A, 7G 06K 7/00 B

2000-10-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06K 13/08 A, 7G 06K 7/00 B

1998-07-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BERG ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING B.V.

1996-04-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HIYAMA, NAOKI

1996-04-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SUZUKI, KENJI

1996-04-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DIMONDI, VINCENT, D.

1996-04-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TAKAI, NOBUEI

1996-04-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LWEE, NAI HOCK

1996-04-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MASUDA, HIROSHI

1996-04-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHIMAUCHI, HIROAKI

1996-04-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BERG ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING B.V.

1996-04-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONNECTOR SYSTEMS TECHNOLOGY N.V.

1996-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951212

1996-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB