Global patent index - EP 0702985 B1

EP 0702985 B1 2000-03-22 - Safety flag for Skisports

Title (en)

Safety flag for Skisports

Title (de)

Sicherheits-Torflagge für den Skisport

Title (fr)

Drapeau de sécurité pour le ski sportif

Publication

EP 0702985 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95114593 A

Priority

AT 181694 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0702985A1] The banner (4) fits detachably over left- and right-hand gate bars (2,3) which can incorporate hinge joints if desired. Mounting sleeves (A,B) at the banner ends allow the bars to pass through. At the top end of one sleeve (B) a safety stocking (5), closed at its top end and fitting over the bar top end. A fixing device can also be provided at the top or bottom end of the sleeve, being fixed to the bar and pref. of rubber or similar elastic material. Such material can also be used for the middle part (III) of the banner. At the other sleeve (A) an open or closed clamping sleeve (7) can be fixed, this being pref. secured to the bar (3) detachably by a clamping lever (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 19/06 (2006.01); A63C 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 19/062 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0702985 A1 19960327; EP 0702985 B1 20000322; AT 190859 T 20000415; DE 59508037 D1 20000427

INPADOC legal status

2005-09-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050916

2003-07-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-06-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-05-06 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020917

2002-09-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020916

2001-09-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010928

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-09-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010928

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-09-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010927

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-09-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010906

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-08-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010821

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO TECNICO ING. A. MANNUCCI

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. W. STEUDTNER

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508037

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-27

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 190859

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1997-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971008

1996-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960820

1996-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI SE