Global Patent Index - EP 0703003 B1

EP 0703003 B1 2000-01-19 - Hydrocarbon conversion catalysts

Title (en)

Hydrocarbon conversion catalysts

Title (de)

Katalysator zur Umwandlung von Kohlenwasserstoffen

Title (fr)

Catalyseurs de conversion des hydrocarbures

Publication

EP 0703003 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95202240 A

Priority

  • EP 95202240 A
  • EP 94202422 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0703003A1] The present invention provides a catalyst comprising a very ultrastable zeolite Y (VUSY) in which less than 15% of the total amount of aluminium (Al) present is octahedrally co-ordinated; a process for preparing the zeolite; and a hydrocarbon conversion process using the catalyst.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01J 29/08; B01J 29/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 29/08 (2006.01); B01J 29/06 (2006.01); B01J 29/10 (2006.01); B01J 29/12 (2006.01); B01J 29/14 (2006.01); B01J 29/16 (2006.01); B02C 17/16 (2006.01); B02C 17/18 (2006.01); B22D 11/12 (2006.01); C01B 39/24 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C08L 83/06 (2006.01); C10G 11/05 (2006.01); C10G 47/16 (2006.01); C10G 47/18 (2006.01); C10G 47/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 29/084 (2013.01); C10G 11/05 (2013.01); C10G 47/16 (2013.01); B01J 2229/16 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 4916096 A 19900410 - HOEK AREND [NL], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0703003 A1 19960327; EP 0703003 B1 20000119; AU 3018195 A 19960307; AU 697549 B2 19981008; CA 2156681 A1 19960225; CN 1119668 A 19960403; DE 69514599 D1 20000224; DE 69514599 T2 20000706; ES 2142448 T3 20000416; JP H0866634 A 19960312; SG 34257 A1 19961206; TW 358120 B 19990511; US 5954946 A 19990921

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000831

2005-08-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050818

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20010911

2001-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010301

2001-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010501

2001-04-23 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2001-04-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20000818

2001-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010301

2001-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.

- Effective date: 20000831

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000819

2000-08-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000819

2000-08-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000818

2000-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142448 T3

2000-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69514599 20000224

2000-02-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1998-08-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980709

1996-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960712

1996-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE